Humboldt Baykeeper v. Royal Gold, LLC

Plaintiff: Humboldt Baykeeper
Defendant: Royal Gold, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv06285
Filed: October 31, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/24/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
June 19, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/31/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 8/24/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/19/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
December 5, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 12 extension of time. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humboldt Baykeeper v. Royal Gold, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humboldt Baykeeper
Represented By: Anthony Michael Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Gold, LLC
Represented By: James Robert Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?