Ecological Rights Foundation v. Schmidbauer Lumber et al
Plaintiff: Ecological Rights Foundation
Defendant: Schmidbauer Lumber and Schmidbauer Building Supply
Case Number: 1:2016cv07401
Filed: December 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Eureka Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/31/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 37 Stipulation Vacate Case Management Conference on July 12, 2017. Case Management Conference is continued to August 15, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Re 34 Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/14/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Stipulation to VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 27 Stipulation TO EXTEND TIME FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ecological Rights Foundation v. Schmidbauer Lumber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ecological Rights Foundation
Represented By: Jodene Louise Isaacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schmidbauer Lumber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schmidbauer Building Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?