Mullins v. New York Marine & General Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Edward Mullins
Defendant: New York Marine & General Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2017cv02518
Filed: May 3, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Edward Mullins filed by Edward Mullins. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 14, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PURSUANT TO FRE 502 FOR ENTRY OF A CLAWBACK ORDER filed by New York Marine & General Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 14, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
May 16, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference and Other Pending Deadlines filed by Edward Mullins. Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 16, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullins v. New York Marine & General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Mullins
Represented By: Brian Paul Brosnahan
Represented By: Veronica Nauts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Marine & General Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew B. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?