Zoellner v. City of Arcata et al
Plaintiff: Kyle C Zoellner
Defendant: City of Arcata and Tom Chapman
Case Number: 1:2018cv04471
Filed: July 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Eureka Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Illman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 382 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER RE: LACK OF PROBABLE CAUSE ELEMENT. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/17/2022. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2022)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR MORE TIME re 366 Trial Brief filed by Kyle Christopher Zoellner. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/10/2022. (jsclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2022)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/29/2022. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2022)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on September 16, 2022. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2022)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 208 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 201 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration and to Amend Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2022)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 111 Motion to Compel. (dmrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 107 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Fifth Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 84 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zoellner v. City of Arcata et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle C Zoellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Arcata
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?