Brooks v. Saul
Plaintiff: Keisha Brooks
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv05165
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed in a Social Security Case by Keisha Brooks. Andrew Saul served on 9/30/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for all further proceedings. Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/17/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge For All Purposes. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/12/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Bolin, Timothy) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 Acknowledgment of Receipt by U.S. Marshal re #8 Summons Issued (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 5, 2019 Service packet delivered to the U.S. Marshals Post Box in the Clerks Office mailroom. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM Forms)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Keisha Brooks.. (Parnes, Joanna) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: Initial Case Management Conference set as control date for 3/12/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Keisha Brooks. (Parnes, Joanna) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF DECISION OF COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY against Andrew Saul. Filed byKeisha Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parnes, Joanna) (Filed on 8/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha Brooks
Represented By: Joanna H Parnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew Saul
Represented By: Timothy R. Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?