Chinsami v. CMF Warden-Jared Lozano
Plaintiff: Shu Chinsami
Defendant: Calif Medical Facility Warden-Jared Lozano
Case Number: 1:2019cv05888
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Remark: Case transferred from California Northern has been opened in Eastern District of California as case 2:19-cv-02298. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 13, 2019 Remark: Case file electronically transferred to the Eastern District of California. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of Transfer Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 11/13/2019. The clerk hereby certifies that on 11/13/2019 a copy of this Order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the docket. (rmilc1s, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 Received Document by Shu Chinsami. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shu Chinsami. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 Note to Clerk requesting update and copy of Petition. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shu Chinsami.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Calif Medical Facility Warden-Jared Lozano. Filed byShu Chinsami. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to court from Plaintiff regarding Statement of Claim #8 (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shu Chinsami. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Plaintiff to Court Help Center. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/28/2019. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 10/28/2019. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 Received Document by Shu Chinsami. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chinsami v. CMF Warden-Jared Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shu Chinsami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calif Medical Facility Warden-Jared Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?