Chavez Sol v. San Francisco County Jail Facility
Plaintiff: Salvador Roland Chavez Sol, Jr.
Defendant: San Francisco County Jail Facility
Case Number: 1:2020cv01901
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Dismissal with Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 04/17/2020. The clerk hereby certifies that on 04/17/2020 a copy of this Order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the docket. (rmilc1s, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk hereby certifies that on 04/17/2020 a copy of this Order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the docket. (rmilc1s, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Salvador Roland Chavez Sol, Jr. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against San Francisco County Jail Facility. (IFPP) No Process. Filed bySalvador Roland Chavez Sol, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Salvador Roland Chavez Sol, Jr. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez Sol v. San Francisco County Jail Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco County Jail Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Roland Chavez Sol, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?