Colorado v. Saul
Plaintiff: George S Colorado
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv06218
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Robert M Illman
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 9/18/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Randomly Assigned Magistrate Judge For All Purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/18/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Harada, Lynn) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Copy of #1 Complaint, #5 Social Security Procedural Order and #6 Order Granting IFP Sent to U.S. Attorney's Office. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Andrew Saul, Commission of Social Security on 09/04/2020 by George S Colorado. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by George S Colorado.. (Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by George S Colorado. (Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. Filed byGeorge S Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 9/2/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew Saul
Represented By: Lynn Harada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George S Colorado
Represented By: Katherine Rose Siegfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?