Fuhrmann v. Commissioner of Social Secuity
Plaintiff: Kimberlee Anne Fuhrmann
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Secuity
Case Number: 1:2021cv02290
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kimberlee Anne Fuhrmann.. (Pena-Mancinas, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Secuity.. (Coder, Ellinor) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 13, 2021 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE By U.S. Attorney's Office and SSA. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 9, 2021 Remark: Service documents emailed to Social Security Administration and Attorney's Office. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/14/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Pena-Mancinas, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kimberlee Anne Fuhrmann. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena-Mancinas, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Secuity. Filed byKimberlee Anne Fuhrmann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena-Mancinas, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/31/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuhrmann v. Commissioner of Social Secuity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Secuity
Represented By: Ellinor R Coder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberlee Anne Fuhrmann
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena-Mancinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?