Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California et al v. Associated Surface Prep, Inc.

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California and Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Associated Surface Prep, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv04621
Filed: August 11, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/06/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
August 31, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; ORDER THEREON. The time for defendant to respond to plaintiffs' complaint is extended to October 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/31/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 18, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/18/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California et al v. Associated Surface Prep, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Ryan Blake Kadevari
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Ryan Blake Kadevari
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Ryan Blake Kadevari
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Ryan Blake Kadevari
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Surface Prep, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?