Robbins v. Phillips 66 Company

Plaintiff: Dean A. Robbins
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00292
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order 54 Discovery Order re: 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 49 Discovery Order. Discovery Hearing set for 2/1/2019 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel shall call the following phone number: 1-888-684-8852/Access Code: 2925506. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 1/7/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 49 Discovery Order re: 43 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Dean A. Robbins. Discovery Hearing set for 1/9/2019 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/17/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 46 Discovery Order re: ECF No. 43 . The Court ORDERS the parties to file a corrected Exhibit A by noon on December 14, 2018. No chambers copy is required. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/13/2018. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 41 Discovery Order re: ECF No. 35 . Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer by 11/29/2018 and file an updated joint letter by 12/6/2018 if unable to resolve their dispute. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 11/19/2018. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbins v. Phillips 66 Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean A. Robbins
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company
Represented By: Lisa M. Bertain
Represented By: Alexander James Bukac
Represented By: Nathan Randall Jaskowiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?