Curtis Sneede, et al v. Kenneth Kizer, et al

Defendant: Kenneth Kizer, Health and Human Services, Department of, Jesse R. Huff and CA Dept of Finance
3rd_party_defendant: Louis W. Sullivan
3rd_party_plaintiff: Kenneth Kizer
Case Number: 3:1989cv01932
Filed: June 5, 1989
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Welfare
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2013 319 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Modify January 5, 1990 Injunction. Motions terminated: 309 MOTION to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/26/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
August 29, 2013 316 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Enlarge Time to Address 309 MOTION to Alter Judgment. Responses due by 9/23/2013. Replies due by 10/7/2013. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/28/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 1, 2013 312 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Enlarge Time to Address Defendant Sebelius's Motion for Relief from Judgment. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 309 MOTION to Alter Judgment. Responses due by 8/30/2013. Replies due by 9/12/2013. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/31/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis Sneede, et al v. Kenneth Kizer, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Kizer
Represented By: Ralph M. Johnson
Represented By: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: John K. Van De Kamp
Represented By: Stephanie Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health and Human Services, Department of
Represented By: John Anthony Mendez
Represented By: Justin Michael Sandberg
Represented By: Stephen Lewis Schirle
Represented By: Hadara Rachel Stanton
Represented By: George Christopher Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse R. Huff
Represented By: Ralph M. Johnson
Represented By: John K. Van De Kamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA Dept of Finance
Represented By: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Stephanie Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Louis W. Sullivan
Represented By: Justin Michael Sandberg
Represented By: George Christopher Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: Kenneth Kizer
Represented By: Ralph M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?