Biancur, et al v. Hickey, et al

Plaintiff: A. Lee Biancur, Linda Biancur, La Rue W. Bean, Allen J. Murphy, Robert Schlenzig and Gail Schlenzig
Defendant: John A. Hickey, Mamie Tang, Zrenda Dunn & Swann and D. E. Frey
Case Number: 3:1995cv02145
Filed: June 27, 1995
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2014 514 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 511 Ex Parte Application. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
August 14, 2014 510 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 507 Ex Parte Application. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
May 3, 2011 501 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 500 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by La Rue W. Bean, Allen J. Murphy, Linda Biancur, Gail Schlenzig, Robert Schlenzig, A. Lee Biancur. Signed by Magistrate Judge JAMES LARSON on 5/3/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
August 2, 2010 497 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 2, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
April 20, 2010 492 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT by Judge William Alsup [granting 485 Motion renewal of judgmentrenewal of judgment; granting 488 Motion renewal of judgmentrenewal of judgment]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biancur, et al v. Hickey, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. Lee Biancur
Represented By: Christopher T. Heffelfinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Biancur
Represented By: Peter A. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Rue W. Bean
Represented By: Peter A. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen J. Murphy
Represented By: Peter A. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schlenzig
Represented By: Peter A. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Schlenzig
Represented By: Peter A. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Hickey
Represented By: David J. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mamie Tang
Represented By: Christopher J. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zrenda Dunn & Swann
Represented By: John Spencer Guy Worden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. E. Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?