UTHE Technology Corp v. Allen, et al

Plaintiff: UTHE Technology Corporation
Defendant: Peter Kwan, Y. K. Chow, Francis Chua, Katherine Yip, Harry Allen and Aetrium, Inc.
Case Number: 3:1995cv02377
Filed: August 20, 1993
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2016 244 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/26/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 12, 2016 239 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/12/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
June 24, 2016 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE Motions due by 7/14/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/24/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
April 20, 2016 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/20/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 12, 2016 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/19/2016 at NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/12/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 23, 2016 221 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/23/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 14, 2016 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Hon. William Alsup granting 213 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Rishi Bhandari for UTHE Technology Corporation. Attorney Clinton Judd McCord; Michael Dockterman and Heather H. Harrison terminated.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 8, 2016 214 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE RE MOTION PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
January 11, 2016 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SCHEDULING TRIAL re 211 MOTION for Hearing filed by Harry Allen, Aetrium, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 211 MOTION for Hearing, [ 210] MOTION for Summary Judgment., Motions terminated: 211 MOTION for Hearing filed by Harry Allen, Aetrium, Inc.. Responses due by 3/14/2016. Replies due by 3/21/2016. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2016 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/11/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
September 13, 2013 199 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/13/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
September 9, 2013 195 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 176 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 4, 2013 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE HEARING ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/4/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 2, 2013 180 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 179 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
June 5, 2013 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF EXPERT DEADLINES by Hon. William Alsup denying 171 Ex Parte Application.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
March 21, 2013 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND VACATING HEARING re 148 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Harry Allen, Aetrium, Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 21, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 15, 2013 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY HEARING re 158 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, 162 Status Report filed by UTHE Technology Corporation, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 158 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, 162 Statu s Report, 155 MOTION for Discovery Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 15, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 11, 2013 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MOTION TO COMPEL AND SETTING DISCOVERY DISPUTE HEARING [re 155 MOTION for Discovery Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents filed by UTHE Technology Corporation]. Response due by noon on 3/14/2013. Four-hour meet-and-confer set for 3/18/2013 starting from 9:00 a.m. through 1:30 p.m. (with a half hour off at noon for lunch) in Attorney Lounge on 18th Floor of federal courthosue. Discovery Hearing set for 3/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/11/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
September 27, 2012 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
August 24, 2012 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE AUGUST 23 LETTER re 140 Letter filed by Harry Allen, Aetrium, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 24, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
June 11, 2012 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUEST FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESET MOTION TO REOPEN CASE. Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/11/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
May 25, 2012 110 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 109 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UTHE Technology Corp v. Allen, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UTHE Technology Corporation
Represented By: Robert Y. Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Kwan
Represented By: Ann S. Crownover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y. K. Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Chua
Represented By: Ann S. Crownover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Yip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Allen
Represented By: Karen Leanne Kennard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetrium, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Leanne Kennard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?