Clark, et al v. State of California, et al

Case Number: 3:1996cv01486
Filed: April 22, 1996
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2015 519 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: REVISIONS TO REMEDIAL PLAN 518 . Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/21/2015. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
July 22, 2011 514 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding participation in defendants' strike teams re 513 Stipulation filed by State of California. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/22/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
June 9, 2011 512 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending deadline for payment of plaintiffs' counsel's first quarter 2011 fees re 511 Stipulation, filed by State of California. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/8/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
January 3, 2011 510 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding attorney's fees re 509 Stipulation filed by State of California. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/3/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 17, 2010 508 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to extend time re 507 Stipulation filed by State of California Motions due by 1/21/2011.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/16/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
October 21, 2010 506 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Amending deadlines regarding Attorney's Fees Negotiations re 504 Stipulation filed by State of California. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/20/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 18, 2010 505 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Governing Plaintffs' Disclosure of Documents Containing Time Entries re 503 Stipulation filed by Derrick Clark. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/18/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 1, 2010 502 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding resolution of attorneys' fees re 501 Stipulation filed by Derrick Clark. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/1/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 16, 2010 500 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 329 Motion to Enforce Judgment; denying 381 Motion to Set Aside (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
July 28, 2010 491 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on July 28, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
May 28, 2010 478 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 475 Stipulation to Supplemsental Trial Exhibits filed by Derrick Clark. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/26/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 25, 2010 476 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Gary Davenport (K2303) 467 Stipulation filed by State of California. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/25/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 20, 2010 466 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Ronald Blake (G-42383) re 462 Stipulation filed by State of California. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/19/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 12, 2010 452 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating writ of Ronald Blake issued on March 23, 2010 re 438 Proposed Order filed by Derrick Clark. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/6/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 11, 2010 450 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding inmate Daniel Mendez (V-42152) re 448 Stipulation filed by State of California. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/11/2010. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 7, 2010 443 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to vacate Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum of Randy Wright issued March 26, 2010 re 440 Proposed Order filed by Derrick Clark. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/7/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 6, 2010 441 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued March 23, 2010 re 438 Proposed Order filed by Derrick Clark. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/6/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
April 27, 2010 436 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on April 27, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 23, 2010 432 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation and ORDER vacating writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum as to Gary Luis Davenport. Signed by Judge Vadas on April 23, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 19, 2010 411 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting stipulation to vacate writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum as to Taijuan Colbert. Signed by Judge Vadas on April 19, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 14, 2010 406 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Vacating Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Anthony Roque. Signed by Judge Vadas on April 14, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 12, 2010 396 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vadas on April 12, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 6, 2010 390 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER compelling production of documents related to deposition of Dr. Scaramozzino and addressing other discovery-related issues. Signed by Judge Vadas on April 6, 2010.(cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
March 29, 2010 377 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum for Inmate Brandon Petties for April 26, 2010 Evidentiary Hearing re 354 Writ Issued. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/29/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 26, 2010 364 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued for Gary Luis Davenport. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/26/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 23, 2010 357 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding pretrial deadlines re 330 Stipulation filed by Derrick Clark, Motions in Limine due by 3/19/2010. Responses due by 3/26/2010.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/23/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 10, 2010 328 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Compliance with Local Rules and Standing Orders re: Submission of Chambers Copies. Signed by Judge Vadas on March 10, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 2, 2010 315 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding depositions of trial witnesses re 314 Stipulation filed by Derrick Clark. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/1/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 16, 2010 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 298 Motion for Extension of Time to File (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
December 2, 2009 290 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 12/2/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
November 23, 2009 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting scheduling. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/23/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark, et al v. State of California, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?