Phelps v. Alameda

Case Number: 3:1998cv02002
Filed: May 15, 1998
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2013 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 126 REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (CONSTRUED AS REQUEST FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 4, 2013.(mmcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
January 19, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 78 MOTION TO STAY PETITION; DENYING MOTION TO FILE AMENDED PETITION; DENYING 84 MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, 90 LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY, AND 89 SANCTIONS; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE FILE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 19, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
May 27, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 83 PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 27, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
February 5, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The time for filing an answer to the petition is extended to and including March 3, 2010. If petitioner wishes to file a traverse, it shall be filed no later than April 16, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
October 19, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE ANSWER. Unless the petition is fully resolved in respondent's favor, respondent is ordered to file his answer and to submit the relevant portions of the state court record no later than 21 days after resolution of the petition for certiorari. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 19, 2009 (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
August 27, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Respondent is directed to file, within 60 days of the date of this order, an answer and supporting memorandum of points and authorities, along with a copy of all porti ons of the state record relevant to a determination of the issues presented by the petition. Petitioner may, within 45 days after the filing of the answer, file a reply. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 27, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phelps v. Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?