Dorton v. Dickinson

Case Number: 3:1998cv02003
Filed: May 15, 1998
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
June 23, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 23, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
May 13, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE TRAVERSE AND REPLY; DIRECTING PETITIONER TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 13, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 10, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 10, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
April 5, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED PETITION AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE TRAVERSE AND REPLY MEMORANDUM. To the extent the Application seeks an order allowing Dorton to file an amend ed petition to add a new claim or claims, the Application is denied without prejudice to Dorton's filing a motion to amend pursuant to Rule 15(a). To the extent the Application seeks an extension of time to file a traverse and reply memorandum, the Application is granted; the deadline for Dorton to file a traverse and reply memorandum is extended to May 7, 2010.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 5, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
February 2, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 2, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
November 13, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PETITIONER'S MOTION TO REINSTATE HABEAS CORPUS PETITION; VACATING NOVEMBER 20, 2009 HEARING; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Respondent shall file her opposition or other response to the merits of the motion to reinstate no later than 14 da ys after resolution of the petition for certiorari, and petitioner shall file any reply thereto no later than 7 days after the filing of respondent's opposition or response, at which time the Court, unless the parties are otherwise advised, will take the motion to reinstate under submission. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 13, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
October 23, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 23, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorton v. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?