Eslaminia, et al v. FBI, et al

Plaintiff: Reza Eslaminia, Mina Hakimi Eslamina and Amir Eslamina
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation and US Dept of Justice
Case Number: 3:1999cv03249
Filed: July 6, 1999
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re Consent under FRCP 73. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/02/2011. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
November 18, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER setting deadline of 01/03/2012 to file a fee request. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/18/2011. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
October 28, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER. Signed by Judge Marilyn H. Patel on 10/28/2011. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
September 16, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 90 Administrative Motion for further submission of documents for in camera review (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
August 26, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE FURTHER SUBMISSIONS: In view of the court's understanding of the declassification provisions of Executive Order 13526, the court requests that defendants advise the court of their intentions with respect to declassification; whether the y intend to invoke any of the subparagraphs and, if so, identify them and set forth the bases upon which they would seek such invocation. Also, if the court misperceives the effect of the Executive Order, defendants shall explain their interpretatio n. Defendants shall file this requested submission on or before September 15, 2011. Plaintiffs may respond on or before September 30, 2011. No further submissions shall be made; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/25/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eslaminia, et al v. FBI, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reza Eslaminia
Represented By: David A Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mina Hakimi Eslamina
Represented By: David A Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amir Eslamina
Represented By: David A Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Dept of Justice
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?