Alperin et al v. Vatican Bank et al

Plaintiff: Emil Alperin, Jewgenija Romanova, Organization of Ukrainian Antifascist Resistance Fighters, Ukrainian Union of Nazi Victims and Prisoners, Vladimir Brodich, William Dorich, Igor Najfeld, Lizabeth Lalich, Mladen Djuricich, Robert Predrag Gakovich, Nevenka Vukasovic Malinowski, Eli Rotem, Milorad Skoric, Veljko Miljus, Fred Zlatko Harris, Milja Conger, Allen Dolfi Herskovich, Bogdan Kljaic, David Levy, Zdenka Baum Ruchwarger-Levy, Vladan Celebonovic, Daniel Pyevich, Koviljka Popovic, Jasenovac Research Institute, The International Union of Former Juvenile Prisoners of Fascism of Ukraine, Russia, and Belarus, The Republic of Serbian Krajina in Exile, Nadezda Bates, Dubravca Pavic, Mileva Reljanovic and Independent Council of Gypsies in Serbia
Defendant: The Franciscan Order and Croatian Confraternity of San Girolamo
Amicus: Franciscan Friars of California, Inc.
Miscellaneous: The Province of St. Barbara
Case Number: 3:1999cv04941
Filed: November 4, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2009 468 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SEVENTH AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 13, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 4, 2009 467 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING NOVEMBER 6, 2009 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SEVENTH AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 4, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
September 24, 2009 461 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT: Plaintiffs have failed to demonstrate the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over the instant action under 28 U.S.C. § 1331, 1332, or 1350, and, accordingly, OFMs motion is hereby GRANTED, and the instant action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 11, 2009 458 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ORDER OF FRIARS MINOR'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 11, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 9, 2009 457 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 9, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 8, 2009 454 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING SEPTEMBER 11, 2009 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 8, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
August 21, 2009 446 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 21, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 12, 2009 443 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. T Nguyen is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 12, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
May 27, 2009 430 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT OFM'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION. OFM may file a memorandum not to exceed 35 pages in length. In opposing OFM's motion, plaintiffs likewise may file a memorandum no t to exceed 35 pages in length. In light of the extended page limits, OFM's motion to dismiss shall be filed no later than June 12, 2009, plaintiffs' opposition shall be filed no later than July 2, 2009, OFM's reply shall be filed no later than July 13, 2009, and the hearing on the motion will be on July 31, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 27, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 19, 2009 426 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT OFM'S MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court will not at this time preclude OFM from noticing its motion for hearing on a date to be selected hereafter by OFM. Should the date selected b y OFM prove to be inconvenient for plaintiffs, or otherwise unacceptable to them, the Court will consider a request to change the date. In light of OFM's stated intent to file a motion to dismiss, the Status Conference currently scheduled for May 22, 2009 is continued to August 28, 2009. A Joint Status Conference Statement shall be filed no later than August 21, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 19, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
April 27, 2009 421 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 27, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 14, 2009 412 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than May 1, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
March 11, 2009 409 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT. The hearing is continued to April 17, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
February 23, 2009 407 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to May 22, 2009. Plaintiffs are directed to file their motion to amend no later than March 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
December 23, 2008 402 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 401 Stipulation To Continue Deadline For Filing Joint Letter Regarding Status of Jurisdictional Discovery (Ext. to 1/26/2009) filed by Croatian Co-fraternity of the College of San Girolamo Degli Illirici, Croatian Confraternity of San Girolamo, The Franciscan Order, Croatian Franciscans, Franciscan Oder (OFM) Including. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/23/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 5, 2008 400 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE DECEMBER 12, 2008 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to February 27, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 5, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
November 21, 2008 397 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT DECEMBER 12, 2008 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 21, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 17, 2008 394 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 393 Letter filed by Emil Alperin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/17/2008. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alperin et al v. Vatican Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emil Alperin
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewgenija Romanova
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organization of Ukrainian Antifascist Resistance Fighters
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ukrainian Union of Nazi Victims and Prisoners
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir Brodich
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dorich
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Igor Najfeld
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizabeth Lalich
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mladen Djuricich
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Predrag Gakovich
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevenka Vukasovic Malinowski
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Rotem
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milorad Skoric
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veljko Miljus
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Zlatko Harris
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milja Conger
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Dolfi Herskovich
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bogdan Kljaic
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Levy
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zdenka Baum Ruchwarger-Levy
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladan Celebonovic
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Pyevich
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koviljka Popovic
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasenovac Research Institute
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The International Union of Former Juvenile Prisoners of Fascism of Ukraine, Russia, and Belarus
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Republic of Serbian Krajina in Exile
Represented By: K. Lee Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadezda Bates
Represented By: Thomas Dewey Easton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dubravca Pavic
Represented By: Thomas Dewey Easton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mileva Reljanovic
Represented By: Thomas Dewey Easton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Independent Council of Gypsies in Serbia
Represented By: Thomas Dewey Easton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Franciscan Order
Represented By: Joshua G. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Croatian Confraternity of San Girolamo
Represented By: David L. Winnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Franciscan Friars of California, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Paul Brosnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: The Province of St. Barbara
Represented By: Brian Paul Brosnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?