King v. Lamarque

Case Number: 3:2000cv01988
Filed: June 2, 2000
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2013 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 142 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 14, 2009 138 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The petition for writ of habeas corpus is granted. Judgment is entered accordingly. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 6, 2009 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION IN LIMINE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
March 12, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 127 Motion FOR AUTHORITY TO SUBPOENA WITNESSES (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 9, 2009 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING EVIDENTIARY HEARING: Evidentiary hearing set for 4/8/09 at 10:00 a.m.. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
February 11, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT. Petitioner's brief due 2/17/09, respondent's response due 2/24/09. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
September 2, 2008 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER substituting deft Evans in place of Subia. Signed by Judge Illston on 8/31/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
April 13, 2007 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER designating this case as an e.filing case. A case management conference is set for 5/18/07 at 2:30 p.m. A joint case management conference statement is due one week prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/12/07. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Lamarque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?