MHC Financing, et al v. City of San Rafael

Plaintiff: MHC Financing Limited Partnership and Grapeland Vista, Inc
Defendant: City of San Rafael
Intervenor_dft: Contempo Marin Homeowners Association
Case Number: 3:2000cv03785
Filed: April 4, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2009 618 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS re doc 617 filed by MHC Financing Limited Partnership, Grapeland Vista, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/9/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
April 4, 2009 609 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requesting Submission re 585 Affidavit in Support of Motion filed by MHC Financing Limited Partnership, Grapeland Vista, Inc, 600 MOTION for Leave to File filed by MHC Financing Limited Partnership, Grapeland Vista, Inc (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2009)
January 30, 2009 606 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Parties to Identify Evidence in Record (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MHC Financing, et al v. City of San Rafael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MHC Financing Limited Partnership
Represented By: David J. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grapeland Vista, Inc
Represented By: David J. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Rafael
Represented By: Clark E. Guinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Contempo Marin Homeowners Association
Represented By: Craig C. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?