Cohn, et al v. Critical Path Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Arnold Cohn, Florida State Board of Administration and Sambasiba Avirneni
Defendant: Critical Path Inc., David Hayden, David A. Thatcher, Douglas Hickey, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP and William Rinehart
Case Number: 3:2001cv00551
Filed: December 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER AUTHORIZING FURTHER DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS TO CHARITABLE ORGANIZATIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 8, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER RE REMAINING SETTLEMENT FUNDS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 231 REQUEST FOR INFORMATION RE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING SETTLEMENT FUNDS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohn, et al v. Critical Path Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Cohn
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida State Board of Administration
Represented By: Samule D. Heins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sambasiba Avirneni
Represented By: John W. Allured
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Critical Path Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Thatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
Represented By: Samule D. Heins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Rinehart
Represented By: Jan Nielsen Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?