Nursing Home Pension Fund et al v. Oracle Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Nursing Home Pension Fund, UCFW Local 56 Retail Meat Pension Fund, Drifton Finance Corporation, Robert D. Sawyer, Oleg "Alex&quot Trepetin, Thomas Wright, Dzung Chu, Ryan Kuehmichel, Misop Lessard and Ke Wan
Defendant: Oracle Corporation, Lawrence J. Ellison, Jeffrey O. Henley and Edward J. Sanderson
Special_master: Edward A. Infante
Case Number: 3:2001cv00988
Filed: July 1, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2009 1624 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1621 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
June 16, 2009 1620 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 12, 2009 1618 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER : Vacating June 16 deadline for pretrial submission. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
April 22, 2009 1615 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: recent decisions. re 1614 Signed by Judge Illston on 4/21/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 2, 2009 1613 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: recent decisions re 1612 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009) Modified on 4/3/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2009 1611 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PARTIES' RECENT FILINGS. Granting 1602 , denying 1607 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
February 24, 2009 1606 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: recent decisions (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 12, 2009 1596 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing equipment. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/12/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
January 14, 2009 1581 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing pretrial and trial to 6/30/09 and 7/17/09, respectively. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/13/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
December 30, 2008 1579 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2009 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Illston on 12/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 16, 2008 1577 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting 1556 Motion for Pro Hac Vice : Counsel must provide/efile the name and address of local counsel. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
September 22, 2008 1486 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston denying 1480 Motion ; setting 1/9/09 for motion hearing (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008) Modified on 9/23/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2008 1478 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nursing Home Pension Fund et al v. Oracle Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nursing Home Pension Fund
Represented By: Roger M. Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UCFW Local 56 Retail Meat Pension Fund
Represented By: Roger M. Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drifton Finance Corporation
Represented By: Roger M. Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Sawyer
Represented By: Roger M. Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oleg "Alex&quot Trepetin
Represented By: Roger M. Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Wright
Represented By: Roger M. Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dzung Chu
Represented By: Roger M. Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Kuehmichel
Represented By: Roger M. Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misop Lessard
Represented By: Roger M. Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ke Wan
Represented By: Roger M. Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle Corporation
Represented By: Dorian Estelle Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence J. Ellison
Represented By: Dorian Estelle Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey O. Henley
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J. Sanderson
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Edward A. Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?