Felix v. Hennessey

Petitioner: Scott Emerson Felix
Respondent: Michael Hennessey
Case Number: 3:2001cv03138
Filed: September 21, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2012 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Appointing Michael Clough to Represent Plaintiff/Appellant in Case USCA 10-16984. (dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
September 14, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING LETTER FROM PETITIONER. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 14, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
August 11, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 11, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
May 12, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ADDITIONAL BRIEF RE MOOTNESS ISSUE by Judge Alsup granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
April 28, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING ON MOOTNESS ISSUE. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 28, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
September 21, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS HABEAS PETITION. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 21, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
April 6, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE REQUEST FOR EXTENSION (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
March 26, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
November 18, 2008 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of respondent and against petitioner. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/17/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 5, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felix v. Hennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott Emerson Felix
Represented By: Janice Ryan Mazur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Hennessey
Represented By: Gregory A. Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?