Boston Scientific Corporation et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Boston Scientific Corporation, Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc, Scimed Life Systems, Inc. and Schneider (Europe) GmbH
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson and Cordis Corporation
Case Number: 3:2002cv00790
Filed: October 15, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2009 907 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. All parties to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
September 14, 2009 904 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: BILL OF COSTS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
July 6, 2009 890 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (as amended by the Court). Signed by Judge Illston on 7/2/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
May 19, 2009 888 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting 6/15/09 deadline re: Judgment. Signed by Judge Illston on 5/15/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 5, 2009 886 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING 5/15/09 DEADLINE RE: JUDGMENT (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
April 20, 2009 884 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting 5/1/09 as filing deadline for final judgment. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/17/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 9, 2009 882 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DETERMINING REASONABLE RATE FOR ONGOING ROYALTY. The Court invites the parites to submit a joint form of order by 4/17/09. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
January 16, 2009 877 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/2/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/5/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
November 25, 2008 875 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EQUITABLE RELIEF (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
September 22, 2008 871 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Illston on 9/19/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
February 6, 2008 840 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting 839 Motion for Leave to File Surreply (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boston Scientific Corporation et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Alison R. Aubry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc
Represented By: Antoinette E. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scimed Life Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Antoinette E. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schneider (Europe) GmbH
Represented By: Antoinette E. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Hugh A. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordis Corporation
Represented By: Hugh A. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?