SDV/ACCI, Inc. et al v. AT&T Corporation et al

Case Number: 3:2002cv01529
Filed: March 29, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Assault Libel & Slander Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2009 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Having advised the court that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this case; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this cause of action be dismissed with prejudice, provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this cour t, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy thereof, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/31/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
December 8, 2008 113 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/8/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
April 12, 2006 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE for limited purpose of modifying judgment per stipulation of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/12/06. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
March 22, 2006 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Having advised the court that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this case; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this cause of action be dismissed with prejudice, provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this cour t, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy thereof, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. All pending motions terminated. All pretrial and trial deadlines and dates are hereby vacated. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/22/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SDV/ACCI, Inc. et al v. AT&T Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?