The Saul Zaentz Company v. Sprint Featured Case

Case Number: 3:2002cv01956
Filed: April 22, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2003 125 PERMANENT INJUNCTION, each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/21/03. (tdm, )
July 2, 2003 124 Minute Entry: Daubert hearing - Held; Cross Motions for Summary Judgment - Denied; Plaintiff's Motion to exclude testimony of Michael Gard - Denied; Defendant's Motions to exclude testimony of William Scharf, John Albert-Levy and Mark Berger - Denied; Motion Hearing re 102 , 103 , 104 , 98 , 93 held on 7/2/2003 before Judge Samuel Conti, Motions 102 , 103 , 104 , 98 , 93 terminated.. The following papers are due 7/22/03 - joint jury instructions, joint statement of what the case is about to read to the jury, proposed voir dire questions, list of witnesses with an estimate of what the witness will say and how long the witness will be on the stand, joint verdict form. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (tdm, )
July 1, 2003 123 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 122 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of attorney Edward Rosenthal (tdm, )
June 30, 2003 121 TRANSCRIPT for dates 5/23/03 , Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (tdm, )
June 27, 2003 120 CERTIFICATE/PROOF OF SERVICE by The Saul Zaentz Company re 115 , 116 , 117 , 118 , 119 (tdm, )
June 27, 2003 119 DECLARATION in Support re 115 : Declaration of Norman Rudman (filed under seal) filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 115 ) (tdm, )
June 27, 2003 118 DECLARATION in Support re 115 : Robert Cruzen filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 115 ) (tdm, )
June 27, 2003 117 DECLARATION in Support re 115 : Declaration of Fredrica Drotos filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 115 ) (tdm, )
June 27, 2003 116 DECLARATION in Support re 115 : Declaration of Frank Noonan filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 115 ) (tdm, )
June 27, 2003 115 Memorandum in Opposition re 93 and in support of cross-motion for summary adjudication filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (tdm, )
June 26, 2003 114 CERTIFICATE/PROOF OF SERVICE by Sprint of documents filed 6/26/03 (tdm, )
June 26, 2003 113 DECLARATION in Support re 112 : Declaration of Maura Wogan filed by Sprint. (Related document(s) 112 ) (tdm, )
June 26, 2003 112 Memorandum in Opposition re 98 filed by Sprint. (tdm, )
June 26, 2003 111 CERTIFICATE/PROOF OF SERVICE by The Saul Zaentz Company of documents filed 6/26/03 (tdm, )
June 26, 2003 110 DECLARATION in Support re 107 , 109 : Declaration of Jenna Whitman filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 107 , 109 ) (tdm, )
June 26, 2003 109 Memorandum in Opposition re 103 filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (tdm, )
June 26, 2003 108 Memorandum in Opposition re 104 filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (tdm, )
June 26, 2003 107 Memorandum in Opposition re 102 filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (tdm, )
June 26, 2003 106 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by plaintiff. (tdm, )
June 24, 2003 105 CERTIFICATE/PROOF OF SERVICE by Sprint re 102 , 103 , 104 (tdm, )
June 24, 2003 104 MOTION to exclude the expert testimony of Mark Berger filed by Sprint. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2003 10:00 AM. (tdm, )
June 24, 2003 103 MOTION to exclude the expert testimony of Jon Albert-Levy filed by Sprint. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2003 10:00 AM. (tdm, )
June 24, 2003 102 MOTION to exclude the expert testimony of William Scharf filed by Sprint. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2003 10:00 AM. (tdm, )
June 24, 2003 101 DECLARATION in Support re 98 : Declaration of Paul Halonik filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 98 ) (tdm, )
June 24, 2003 100 DECLARATION in Support re 98 : Declaration of Kathleen Lopes filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 98 ) (tdm, )
June 24, 2003 99 MEMORANDUM in Support re 98 filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 98 ) (tdm, )
June 24, 2003 98 MOTION to exclude testimony of Michael Gard filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2003 10:00 AM. (tdm, )
June 23, 2003 97 ASSOCIATION of Counsel Megan Halvonik for Plaintiff. (tdm, )
June 18, 2003 122 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of attorney Edward Rosenthal; fee paid filed by Sprint. (tdm, )
June 11, 2003 96 CERTIFICATE/PROOF OF SERVICE by Sprint re 95 , 93 , 94 (tdm, )
June 11, 2003 95 DECLARATION in Support re 93 : Declaration of Jessie Beeber filed by Sprint. (Related document(s) 93 ) (tdm, )
June 11, 2003 94 MEMORANDUM in Support re 93 filed by Sprint. (Related document(s) 93 ) (tdm, )
June 11, 2003 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment and briefing schedule, motion due 6/13/03, opposition due 6/27/03, reply due 7/2/03, matter submitted on the papers filed by Sprint. (tdm, )
June 4, 2003 92 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti Plaintiff's motion to continue Defendant's motion on the issue of statutory damages is HEREBY DENIED; Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment on the issue of statutory damages is HEREBY GRANTED; Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment regarding the affirmative defense of fair use is HEREBY GRANTED; Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment regarding the affirmative defense of parody is HEREBY GRANTED; Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment on the issues of substantial similarity, fair use, and parody is HEREBY DENIED. (tdm, )
June 3, 2003 90 Featured Case ORDER RE: Jury Trial Preparation. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/3/03. (tdm, )
June 2, 2003 91 STIPULATION re: briefing schedule and hearing date on Daubert motions by Sprint, The Saul Zaentz Company. (tdm, )
June 2, 2003 89 Featured Case ORDER RE: Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date of Daubert Motions - This Court is in receipt of the parties' stipulation to extend the briefing schedule and hearing date for Daubert motions. That stipulation is HEREBY DENIED. In accordance with the case management conference of 5/23/03, a Daubert hearing on the admissibility of expert witnesses will take place on 7/2/03 at 10:00 a.m. The due date for filing the Daubert motions is 6/24/03, and the due date for oppositions is 6/26/03.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/2/03. (tdm, )
May 30, 2003 88 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Zimmerman granting in part 71 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; Defendant is Ordered to produce the 4/5/01 email to plaintiff no later than 6/4/03 (tdm, )
May 30, 2003 87 NOTICE of unavailability by The Saul Zaentz Company. (tdm, )
May 29, 2003 86 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing re 71 held on 5/28/2003 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Matter submitted, Order to be prepared by Court (Court Reporter Jeanne Bishop.) (tdm, )
May 23, 2003 85 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing re 37 , 52 , 29 , 48 held on 5/23/2003 before Judge Samuel Conti. Motions submitted; case continued to 7/2/03 at 10:00 a.m. for a Daubert hearing (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (tdm, )
May 21, 2003 84 OBJECTIONS to Defendant's Errata by The Saul Zaentz Company. (tdm, )
May 21, 2003 83 Reply Memorandum to Motion re 71 filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (tdm, )
May 19, 2003 82 ERRATA to Exhibit A to the declaration of Stephen Dye in support of defendant's reply on cross-motion for summary judgment by Sprint. (tdm, )
May 16, 2003 81 CERTIFICATE/PROOF OF SERVICE by Sprint re 78 , 79 , 80 (tdm, )
May 16, 2003 80 DECLARATION in Support re 78 : Declaration of Stephen Dye filed by Sprint. (Related document(s) 78 ) (tdm, )
May 16, 2003 79 DECLARATION in Support re 78 L Declaration of Andrew Patrick filed by Sprint. (Related document(s) 78 ) (tdm, )
May 16, 2003 78 Memorandum in Opposition re 71 filed by Sprint. (tdm, )
May 16, 2003 77 STIPULATION that the documents produced by defendant Sprint as Initial Disclosures and in Response to plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents are authentic documents by Sprint, The Saul Zaentz Company. (tdm, )
May 14, 2003 73 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to complete expert depositions to 6/30/03.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/14/03. (tdm, )
May 12, 2003 72 DECLARATION in Support re 71 : Declaration of Paul Halvonik filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 71 ) (tdm, )
May 12, 2003 71 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2003 10:00 AM. (tdm, )
May 12, 2003 70 Reply Memorandum to Motion re 52 filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (tdm, )
May 9, 2003 76 CERTIFICATE/PROOF OF SERVICE by Sprint re 75 , 74 (tdm, )
May 9, 2003 75 DECLARATION in Support re 74 : Declaration of Stephen Dye filed by Sprint. (Related document(s) 74 ) (tdm, )
May 9, 2003 74 Reply Memorandum to Motion re 52 filed by Sprint. (tdm, )
May 9, 2003 69 Reply Memorandum to Motion re 29 filed by Sprint. (tdm, )
May 2, 2003 68 DECLARATION in Support re 66 : Declaration of Paul Halvonik filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 66 ) (tdm, )
May 2, 2003 67 DECLARATION in Support re 66 : Declaration of Aggie Rodgers filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 66 ) (tdm, )
May 2, 2003 66 Memorandum in Opposition re 52 filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (tdm, )
May 1, 2003 65 Featured Case ORDER, SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties to meet and confer on the record in a god faith effort to resolve their discovery dispute. Failure to resolve this dispute, plaintiff to file a motion to ccompel Motions due by 5/9/2003. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2003 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/1/03. (db, )
April 28, 2003 64 CLERK'S NOTICE: A telephonic conference is scheduled for Thursday, May1, 2003 at 9:00 a.m., to discuss the discovery dispute currently at issue. (tdm, )
April 7, 2003 63 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sprint. (tdm, )
April 3, 2003 62 Featured Case FOURTH DISCOVERY ORDER . Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/2/03. (tdm, )
March 7, 2003 61 Featured Case ORDER re 37 , 52 , SCHEDULING ORDER: the court is in receipt of the parties' stipulation and proposed order, but orders the following schedule for this case. The discovery cut off is unchanged and remains May 21, 2003. The parties' cross-motions for summary judgment wil be heard on May 23, 2003 at 10:00 a.m. Briefing should be completed two weeks prior to that date. The deadline for hearing noticed motions remains June 13, 2003. The pretrial will be at 10:00 a.m. on July 24, 2003. Pretrial statements are due on July 18th. The jury trial will begin at 9:30 a.m. on July 28, 2003.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/7/03. (tdm, )
March 7, 2003 60 STIPULATION re 37 , 52 , 48 to continued discovery cut off and motions by Sprint, The Saul Zaentz Company. (tdm, )
February 25, 2003 59 NOTICE of unavailability by The Saul Zaentz Company. (tdm, )
February 19, 2003 58 CERTIFICATE/PROOF OF SERVICE by Sprint re 52 , 53 , 54 , 55 (tdm, )
February 19, 2003 57 Featured Case APPLICATION AND ORDER Granting Defendant leave to file a combined brief not to exceed 35 pages . Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/18/03. (tdm, )
February 14, 2003 56 CERTIFICATE/PROOF OF SERVICE by Sprint re 52 , 53 , 54 , 55 (tdm, )
February 14, 2003 55 DECLARATION in Support re 52 : Andrew Patrick and in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sprint. (Related document(s) 52 ) (tdm, )
February 14, 2003 54 DECLARATION in Support re 52 : Declaration of James Gassel and in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sprint. (Related document(s) 52 ) (tdm, ) Modified on 2/19/2003 (tdm, ).
February 14, 2003 53 MEMORANDUM in Support re 52 and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sprint. (Related document(s) 52 ) (tdm, ) Modified on 2/19/2003 (tdm, ).
February 14, 2003 52 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Substantial Similarity and the Affirmative Defenses of Fair Use and Parody filed by Sprint. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2003 10:00 AM. (tdm, )
February 14, 2003 51 EXHIBITS re 47 (filed under seal) filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 47 ) (tdm, )
February 14, 2003 50 Proposed Order re 48 Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Halvonik, Paul)
February 14, 2003 49 DECLARATION in Opposition re 48 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 48 ) (Halvonik, Paul)
February 14, 2003 48 First MOTION to Continue Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2003 10:00 AM. (Halvonik, Paul)
February 14, 2003 47 Memorandum in Opposition re 29 , 37 Partial Summary Judgment filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Halvonik, Paul)
January 22, 2003 46 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Cross Motions for Partial Summary Judgment are continued to 3/7/2003 10:00 A.M.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/21/03. (tdm, )
January 6, 2003 45 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/6/2003 before Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Nondispositive motion contested. Parties ordered to meet and confer this week in an effort to resolve their disputes in accordance with views expressed by the Court (Tape #TK 02.) (db, )
January 6, 2003 44 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (db, )
January 2, 2003 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sprint re 42 motion for pro hac vice and proposed order re Attorney Andrew D. Patrick for defendant (db, )
January 2, 2003 42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Defendant, fee paid $60.00, receipt #3342745, for Andrew D. Patrick filed by Sprint. (db, )
December 30, 2002 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Saul Zaentz Company of motion papers for partial summary judgment (db, )
December 30, 2002 40 DECLARATION in Support re 37 by Mark Berger in support of plaitniff's motion for partial summary judgment, with exhibits filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 37 ) (db, )
December 30, 2002 39 MEMORANDUM in Support re 37 motion for partial summary judgment filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 37 ) (db, )
December 30, 2002 38 NOTICE re 37 motion for partial summary judgment concerning affirmative defenses by The Saul Zaentz Company. (db, )
December 30, 2002 37 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT concerning affirmative defenses filed by Saul Zaentz Company. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2003 10:00 AM. (db, ) Modified on 12/31/2002 (db, ).
December 27, 2002 36 Featured Case 3RD DISCOVERY ORDER: Defendant to respond in writing by noon, on 1/3/02. Stating its position on the underlying discovery dispute, defendant to respond to the allegations that it refused to meet and confer pursuant to the initial discovery order enteredn in this case on 12/3/02. A telephone conference is set for 1/6/03 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for plaintiff to get counsel for defendant on the line and contact chambers. . Signed by Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/27/02. (db, )
December 20, 2002 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sprint re 34 , [], 30 , 29 , 31 , 32 , 33 (ci, )
December 20, 2002 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Sttutory Damages by Sprint. (ci, )
December 20, 2002 34 EXHIBIT A re 33 DECLARATION in Support by Donna D. Osborn filed by Sprint. (Related document(s) 33 ) (ci, ) .
December 20, 2002 33 DECLARATION in Support re 29 by Donna D. Osborn re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sprint. (Related document(s) 29 ) (ci, )
December 20, 2002 32 EXHIBIT B re 31 DECLARATION in Support by Jessie F. Beeber filed by Sprint. (Related document(s) 31 ) (ci, ) .
December 20, 2002 31 DECLARATION in Support re 29 by Jessie R. Beeber re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sprint. (Related document(s) 29 ) (ci, )
December 20, 2002 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re 29 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sprint. (Related document(s) 29 ) (ci, )
December 20, 2002 29 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Statutory Damages filed by Sprint. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2002 10:00 AM. (ci, ) .
December 3, 2002 28 Featured Case INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER . Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/2/02. (tdm, )
December 3, 2002 27 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Telephonic Conference for 12/5/02 at 2:00 p.m. re Discovery Dispute (tdm, )
November 22, 2002 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Bernard Zimmerman. (wh, )
November 22, 2002 26 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/22/02. (tdm, )
November 22, 2002 25 DECLARATION in Support re 24 , 22 , 23 : Declaration of Paul Halvonik filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 24 , 22 , 23 ) (tdm, )
November 22, 2002 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re 23 filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Related document(s) 23 ) (tdm, )
November 22, 2002 23 MOTION to Compel Production of Addresses and Telephone Numbers filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (tdm, )
November 22, 2002 22 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Motion for Order Requiring Production of Addresses and Telephone Numbers of Witnesses Identified by Defendant as Likely to have Discoverable Information by The Saul Zaentz Company. (tdm, )
September 27, 2002 21 Featured Case STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: See minutes of 9/27/02 for dates. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/27/03. (tdm, )
September 27, 2002 20 inute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/27/2002 before Judge Samuel Conti. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2003 10:00 AM. Discovery due by 5/21/2003. Last Date Motions can be heard 6/13/2003 at 10:00. Jury Trial set for 7/21/2003 09:30 A.M. (Court Reporter Jeanne Bishop.) (tdm, )
September 23, 2002 19 Featured Case CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/23/02. (tdm, )
September 10, 2002 ADR Phone Conference by RWS (tjs, )
August 27, 2002 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2002 at 10:00 AM. (tdm, )
August 27, 2002 18 Letter confirming the setting of a case management conference on 9/27/02 at 10:00 a.m. from Paul Halvonik. (tdm, )
August 16, 2002 17 Featured Case ORDER granting application for substitution of attorney for defendant Sprint re 9 . Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/16/02. (tdm, )
August 16, 2002 16 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 10 Motion for Jessie Beeber to appear Pro Hac Vice (tdm, )
August 15, 2002 15 Featured Case ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM E-FILING. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/15/02. (tdm, )
August 14, 2002 14 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Samuel Conti for all further proceedings. Judge Patricia V Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/14/02. (lfc, )
August 14, 2002 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (cm, )
August 13, 2002 12 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and proposed order filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Halvonik, Paul)
August 12, 2002 11 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Application for and Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Sprint. (Dye, Stephen)
August 6, 2002 Remark: ADR phone conference has been rescheduled to 9/11/02 at 09:30am (bt, )
August 2, 2002 Received Order re 10 fee paid by Sprint. (lrd, )
August 2, 2002 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jessie F. Beeber filed by Sprint. (lrd, )
July 31, 2002 8 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Complaint FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT by Sprint. (Dye, Stephen)
July 31, 2002 7 NOTICE of need of ADR Phone Conference ADR CERTIFICATION (Halvonik, Paul)
July 31, 2002 Remark : ADR phone conference set for 8/12/02 at 2pm (bt, )
July 30, 2002 9 Application for Substitution of Attorney by Sprint. (lrd, )
July 30, 2002 6 NOTICE of need of ADR Phone Conference (Dye, Stephen)
July 30, 2002 5 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney by Sprint. (Dye, Stephen)
July 17, 2002 4 STIPULATION By All Parties To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint by The Saul Zaentz Company. (Halvonik, Paul)
July 15, 2002 3 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEUDLING Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2002 at 02:00 PM Before Magistrate Patricia V. Trumbull. Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2002. (cm, )
July 10, 2002 Received Order regarding to extend time to respond to complaint by Sprint. (lrd, )
April 22, 2002 Summons Issued as to Sprint (lrd, )
April 22, 2002 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2002. Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2002 at 02:00 PM. (lrd, )
April 22, 2002 1 COMPLAINT summons issued; jury demand against Sprint (Filing fee $150 receipt number 3334218). Filed by The Saul Zaentz Company. (lrd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Saul Zaentz Company v. Sprint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?