Wilson v. Adams

Case Number: 3:2002cv03278
Filed: July 9, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S PETITION AS MOOT AND DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/8/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
December 11, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 42 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. Respondent shall file and serve Answer no later than 2/11/2013. Petitioner may file and serve Traverse no later than March 11, 2013. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/11/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
September 24, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/19/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 19, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Habeas Amended Petition due by 1/18/2013.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/19/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
March 19, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 34 Petitioner's Request to Amend Petition. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/19/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
February 21, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/16/12. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?