People of the State of California, ex rel. et al v. United States Department of Transportation et al

Plaintiff: People of the State of California, ex rel. and Bill Lockyer
Defendant: United States Department of Transportation, Norman Y. Mineta, Federal Aviation Administration and Marion C. Blakey
Intervenor_dft: Town of Mammoth Lakes
Case Number: 3:2002cv04621
Filed: September 24, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2016 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 75 Motion to Alter Judgment and dissolving the injunction; ORDER discharging 12/9/15 Order to Show Cause. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
February 26, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 86 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Town of Mammoth Lakes, Attorney Andrew Morris for Town of Mammoth Lakes added. Attorney Andrew Biel Sabey terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/26/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
December 30, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED Show Cause Response due by 1/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/30/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 9, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Plaintiffs. Show Cause Response due by 1/4/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/9/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
September 21, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court REASSIGN ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/21/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People of the State of California, ex rel. et al v. United States Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of California, ex rel.
Represented By: Jamie B. Jefferson
Represented By: Janill L. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Jamie B. Jefferson
Represented By: Janill L. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Transportation
Represented By: Gail Orendorff
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Y. Mineta
Represented By: Gail Orendorff
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Represented By: Gail Orendorff
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion C. Blakey
Represented By: Gail Orendorff
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Town of Mammoth Lakes
Represented By: Andrew Biel Sabey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?