Sierra Club et al v. U.S. Department of Transportation et al

Plaintiff: Sierra Club, National Parks Conservation Association, California Trout and Natural Resources Defense Council
Defendant: U.S. Department of Transportation, Norman Y. Mineta, Federal Aviation Administration and Marion C. Blakey
Intervenor_dft: Town of Mammoth Lakes
Case Number: 3:2002cv04623
Filed: September 24, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 69 Motion to Alter Judgment and dissolving the injunction. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
February 26, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Attorney Andrew Morris for Town of Mammoth Lakes added. Attorney Andrew Biel Sabey terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/26/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
December 30, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 74 Order to Show Cause filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, National Parks Conservation Association, California Trout, U.S. Department of Transportation, Sierra Club Show Cause Response due by 1/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/30/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 9, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Plaintiffs. Show Cause Response due by 1/4/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/9/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
September 21, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court REASSIGN ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/21/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Club et al v. U.S. Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Susan Britton
Represented By: Trent William Orr
Represented By: Deborah Suzanne Reames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: Susan Britton
Represented By: Trent William Orr
Represented By: Deborah Suzanne Reames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Trout
Represented By: Susan Britton
Represented By: Trent William Orr
Represented By: Deborah Suzanne Reames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Susan Britton
Represented By: Trent William Orr
Represented By: Deborah Suzanne Reames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Transportation
Represented By: Gail Orendorff
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Y. Mineta
Represented By: Gail Orendorff
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Represented By: Gail Orendorff
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion C. Blakey
Represented By: Gail Orendorff
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Town of Mammoth Lakes
Represented By: Andrew Biel Sabey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?