Weaver v. City and County of San Francisco, California

Case Number: 3:2003cv01589
Filed: April 14, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2009 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ILLSTON granting (215) Motion for Settlement in case 3:03-cv-01589-SI; granting (67) Motion for Settlement in case 3:06-cv-07071-SI; granting (69) Motion for Settlement in case 3:06-cv-06953-SI (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
February 20, 2009 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing motion to 3/20/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/20/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
December 23, 2008 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing final approval hearing to 2/20/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 12/19/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. City and County of San Francisco, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?