Satchell et al v. Fedex Express

Plaintiff: Derrick Satchell, Kalini Boykin, Valerie Brown, Rick Gonzales, Cynthia Guerrero, Ken Stevenson, Daniel Sherman, Kevin Smith, Rachel Hutchins, Sophia Shainza Hanif and Tyrone Merritt
Defendant: Fedex Express
Miscellaneous: Angela Alioto & Angela Alioto PLC and Waukeen Q. McCoy
Creditor: AAPLC
Special_master: Swanson Edward and Edward Swanson
Case Number: 3:2003cv02659
Filed: January 13, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2010 936 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MR. McCOY'S REQUEST FOR STAY OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES PENDING RESOLUTION OF RELATED NINTH CIRCUIT APPEAL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
January 13, 2010 906 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MR. McCOY'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 891 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
July 1, 2009 899 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: payment from Monitoring Fund re 898 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
December 29, 2008 890 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES REGARDING MOTION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF 870 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2008) Modified on 12/30/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2008 874 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting elarment for Mccoy to File Opposition re 873 . Signed by Judge Illston on 10/10/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Satchell et al v. Fedex Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Express
Represented By: Barak J. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Satchell
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalini Boykin
Represented By: Eve Hedy Cervantez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Brown
Represented By: Eve Hedy Cervantez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Gonzales
Represented By: Eve Hedy Cervantez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Guerrero
Represented By: Eve Hedy Cervantez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Stevenson
Represented By: Eve Hedy Cervantez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Sherman
Represented By: Eve Hedy Cervantez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Smith
Represented By: Eve Hedy Cervantez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Hutchins
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Shainza Hanif
Represented By: Eve Hedy Cervantez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Merritt
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Angela Alioto & Angela Alioto PLC
Represented By: Angela Alioto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Waukeen Q. McCoy
Represented By: Waukeen Quandrico McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: AAPLC
Represented By: Angela Alioto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Swanson Edward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Edward Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?