Hughes v. Ayers

Petitioner: Kristin W. Hughes
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 3:2003cv02666
Filed: March 25, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2016 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 143 MOTION to Amend Case Management Order for Briefing Record-Based Guilt Phase Claims. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/1/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
May 18, 2016 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER OF FEBRUARY 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/18/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
February 5, 2016 134 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/5/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
July 25, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION REGARDING PROCEDURAL DEFAULT AND GRANTING LEAVE TO MOVE FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
August 10, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 78 Second Ex Parte Application for Second Extension of Time to File Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/10/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
June 21, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 75 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/12/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
April 30, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 73 Motion for Leave to File Discovery Motion One Day Late. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
March 25, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 70 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Motion. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/25/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
December 2, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE MOTION FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/1/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
October 21, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURAL DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/21/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
January 28, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE TRAVERSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/28/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
December 16, 2008 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kristin W. Hughes
Represented By: Mark E. Olive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Represented By: Michael G. Millman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela K. Critchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?