Betz v. Trainer Wortham & Company, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2003cv03231
Filed: July 11, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 20, 2011 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER assessing jury costs (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 7, 2011 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EX-PARTE APPLCIATION RE: EXPERT (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 5, 2011 154 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 23, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEADLINES FOR EXHIBIT LISTS (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
May 23, 2011 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
April 15, 2011 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY AND ORDERING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
February 2, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
November 10, 2010 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betz v. Trainer Wortham & Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?