Edwards Lifesciences LLC et al v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edwards Lifesciences LLC and Endogad Research Pty Limited
Defendant: Cook Incorporated and W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2003cv03817
Filed: August 15, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Wayne D. Brazil
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 789 ORDER GRANTING 788 MOTION FOR REVIEW OF THE CLERK'S TAXATION OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/12/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 787 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 772 Motion for Taxation of Costs. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 784 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 780 783 Motion to Seal. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 776 ORDER GRANTING 775 Stipulation to Continue Hearing. The reply brief shall be due no later than December 12, 2008. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 25, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 769 ORDER GRANTING 768 Stipulation Regarding Gore's Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/27/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER GRANTING 749 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendants' Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/22/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 15, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards Lifesciences LLC et al v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwards Lifesciences LLC
Represented By: Hugh A. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endogad Research Pty Limited
Represented By: Hugh A. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Faucette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer BianRosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?