North Pacifica LLC v. City of Pacifica et al
Plaintiff: North Pacifica LLC
Defendant: City of Pacifica, Pacifica Planning Commission and Pacifica City Council
Case Number: 3:2003cv04108
Filed: September 9, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 JUDGMENT: All claims of the complaint are dismissed with prejudice. This action is therefore dismissed with prejudice as to all defendants. Judgment is entered accordingly. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 172 SCHEDULING ORDER: In the absence of a letter brief from either party explaining claims with prejudice and will enter judgment accordingly on 5/6/09. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting final continuance of case management; cmc continued to 1/30/09 @ 3 p.m.. Signed by Judge Illston on 12/18/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER continuing cmc to 12/22/08. Signed by Judge Illston on 12/4/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER continuing cmc to 12/12/08 re 142 . Signed by Judge Illston on 11/4/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Pacifica LLC v. City of Pacifica et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Pacifica LLC
Represented By: Keith Mitchell Fromm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pacifica
Represented By: J. Leah Castella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacifica Planning Commission
Represented By: Michelle Marchetta Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacifica City Council
Represented By: Michelle Marchetta Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?