Garfield v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Janet H. Garfield
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2003cv04124
Filed: July 8, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker denying 87 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
May 6, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 83 Letter filed by Janet H. Garfield, 78 Notice (Other) filed by Janet H. Garfield, 82 Appeal Fee Payment Request, 79 Notice of Appeal filed by Janet H. Garfield. Plaintiff may bring a motion meeting requirements of FRAP 24(a)(1) within 21 days; failure to do so will result in denial of IFP on appeal. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/6/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
February 5, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker denying 76 Motion to Amend/Correct and admonishing counsel against further misuse of FRCP 59(e) and/or FRCP 60(b). (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
December 12, 2008 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker denying 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 68 Motion for Summary Judgment (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garfield v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet H. Garfield
Represented By: Ian Michael Sammis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Donna Wade Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?