Okinawa Dugong (Dugong Dugon) et al v. Rumsfeld et al

Plaintiff: Okinawa Dugong (Dugong Dugon), Center for Biological Diversity, Turtle Island Restoration Project, Japan Environmental Lawyers Federation, Save The Dugong Foundation, Dugong Network Okinawa, Committee Against Heliport Construction, Save Life Society, Anna Koshiishi, Takuma Higashionna and Yoshikazu Makishi
Defendant: Donald H. Rumsfeld, United States Department of Justice, Robert M. Gates and U.S. Department of Defense
Case Number: 3:2003cv04350
Filed: September 25, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0701 Maritime Subsidy Board
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2015 188 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Granting 163 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/13/2015. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
December 16, 2014 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/16/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 3, 2014 170 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 169 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Modify Scheduling Order filed by Yoshikazu Makishi, Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/3/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
August 8, 2014 156 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 155 152 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental Complaint; and Proposed Order filed by U.S. Department of Defense, Robert M. Gates, Leon Panetta, Chuck Hagel, United States Department o f Justice, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Motions terminated: 152 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental Complaint; and Proposed Order filed by Yoshikazu Makishi, Turtle Island Restoration Project, Center for Biological Diversity, Takuma Higashionna, Save The Dugong Foundation, Anna Koshiishi, Japan Environmental Lawyers Federation, 155 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 152 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental Complaint; and Proposed Order filed by U.S. Department of Defense, Robert M. Gates, Leon Panetta, Chuck Hagel, United States Department of Justice, Donald H. Rumsfeld.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/8/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
February 10, 2012 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Status. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 02/10/2012. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
August 25, 2011 142 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending submission date of joint status report to 9/8/2011; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/24/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 12, 2011 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STATUS; A joint supplemental CMC statement due by 8/25/2011; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/11/2011(awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okinawa Dugong (Dugong Dugon) et al v. Rumsfeld et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Okinawa Dugong (Dugong Dugon)
Represented By: J. Martin Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: J. Martin Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turtle Island Restoration Project
Represented By: J. Martin Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Japan Environmental Lawyers Federation
Represented By: J. Martin Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Save The Dugong Foundation
Represented By: J. Martin Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dugong Network Okinawa
Represented By: J. Martin Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Committee Against Heliport Construction, Save Life Society
Represented By: J. Martin Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Koshiishi
Represented By: J. Martin Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takuma Higashionna
Represented By: J. Martin Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yoshikazu Makishi
Represented By: J. Martin Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald H. Rumsfeld
Represented By: Charles Ray Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Charles Ray Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Gates
Represented By: Charles Ray Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Defense
Represented By: Charles Ray Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?