Singh v. Oakland, City of et al

Case Number: 3:2003cv05246
Filed: November 24, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2009 211 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: This action is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Judgment is entered accordingly. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 2, 2009 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUEST[Docket No. 186] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 9, 2009 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/8/09. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 7, 2009 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION [Docket No. 178] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
May 1, 2009 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 172 Case Management Conference - Further Settlement Conference set for 7/29/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 5/1/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
January 29, 2009 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing case management to 4/24/09 re 165 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 28, 2009 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying request to continue (see order for details) re 163 . Signed by Judge Illston on 1/28/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
October 29, 2008 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing case management conference to 2/6/09 @ 2:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Oakland, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?