Northwest Environmental Advocates et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency

Plaintiff: Northwest Environmental Advocates, The Ocean Conservancy and Baykeeper
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Amicus: State of New York, State of Michigan, State of Wisconsin, State of Minnesota, State of Illinois and Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Intervenor_dft: THE SHIPPING INDUSTRY BALLAST WATER COALITION
Case Number: 3:2003cv05760
Filed: July 10, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR FEES. Dismissed as moot re 127 , 164 , 165 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
July 10, 2009 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: FEE REQUEST (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
June 16, 2009 152 Opinion or Order of the Court Correct order denying request to continue re 150 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 11, 2009 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying request to continue.. (see order for details) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
April 2, 2009 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing motion to 7/17/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/1/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
January 28, 2009 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing motion to 3/20/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/27/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
December 19, 2008 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting 137 Motion to Alter Judgment (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
September 2, 2008 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER modifying the premanent injunction. Signed by Judge Illston on 8/31/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Environmental Advocates et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Environmental Advocates
Represented By: Holly Dawn Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ocean Conservancy
Represented By: Holly Dawn Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baykeeper
Represented By: Holly Dawn Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Martin F. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of New York
Represented By: Timothy L. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Michigan
Represented By: Michael A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Peggy A. Lautenschlager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Mike Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: State of Illinois
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Richard P. Mather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: THE SHIPPING INDUSTRY BALLAST WATER COALITION
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?