Moore v. Richmond Police Department et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv01749
Filed: May 4, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2010 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 29, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
June 15, 2010 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR TRANSCRIPTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 15, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
May 3, 2010 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT. No later than May 21, 2010, defendants shall file and serve their opposition. No later than June 18, 2010, plaintiff shall file and serve any reply. Unless the parties are otherwise informed, the Court, as of June 18, 2010, will take plaintiff's motion to alter or amend the judgment under submission. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 3, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 22, 2010 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 22, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 15, 2010 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRANSCRIPTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 15, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
March 22, 2010 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CALL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 22, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 5, 2010 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD. Gibson Dunn & Crutcher is relieved from their appointment as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 5, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
February 25, 2010 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM AS TO PLAINTIFF GARY B. MOORE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 25, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 24, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD AND DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. Defendants' response to the motion to withdraw is due no later than March 1, 2010. A hea ring on the motion to withdraw is scheduled for March 5, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall arrange to have plaintiff made available to participate by telephone at the March 5, hearing. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 24, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
August 19, 2009 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF DEFENDANTS WITHOUT TRIAL SUBPOENA. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 19, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 4, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO AUGUST 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 4, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
December 10, 2008 82 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPUALTION AND ORDER DISMISSING DR. MATTHEW NOWLIS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 10, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
October 30, 2008 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: NOVEMBER 7, 2008 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Richmond Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?