The Flintkote Company v. General Accident Assurance Company of Canada et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv01827
Filed: May 7, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2010 520 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/27/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
June 21, 2010 517 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING ACTION pending bankruptcy decision; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/18/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
May 13, 2010 515 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/12/2010 02:30 PM; Jury Trial set for 9/14/2010 08:30 AM; Motions Hearing set for 7/13/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/13/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
March 5, 2010 498 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: Pre-Trial Motions and Issues. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/4/10. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
February 23, 2010 494 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/1/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Jury Trial set for 7/6/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/23/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
January 15, 2010 457 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference/Motions Hearing continued to 2/12/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Jury Trial continued to 3/16/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/14/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
October 29, 2009 425 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim of Breach of Implied Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/29/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 27, 2009 423 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel denying 296 Defendants' Motion for application of Canadian law (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
July 8, 2009 288 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER amending Pretrial/Trial dates: Jury Trial set for 10/13/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2009 02:30 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/8/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
May 26, 2009 287 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: Plaintiff's request for discovery of reserves information is GRANTED, and plaintiff's request for reinsurance information is DENIED. Furthermore, defendant SHALL produce unredacted documents in accordance with this order.(awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
February 19, 2009 280 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 2/20/2009 for production of unredacted documents to the court; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/19/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Flintkote Company v. General Accident Assurance Company of Canada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?