Funai Electric Company, Ltd. v. Daewoo Electronics Corporation et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv01830
Filed: May 7, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Referring Judge: James Larson
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2010 996 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/16/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
August 12, 2009 987 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING FEES, EXPENSES AND COSTS TO BE AWARDED TO FUNAI. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/12/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
May 1, 2009 929 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 924 Renewed Emergency Motion to Stay (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 24, 2009 920 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero Granting in Part and Denying in Part without prejudice 803 Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, and Calculation of Prejudgment Interest and Amending Court's April 20, 2009 Order to Increase Amount of Bonds Required to Stay Execution of the Judgment Against Dec and DEAM (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 20, 2009 914 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero re Defendants' Motion for Clarification of Court's April 9, 2009 Order re Supersedeas Bond 911 (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 9, 2009 907 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 892 Motion to Stay (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
April 2, 2009 891 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 887 Motion to Stay (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
March 9, 2009 859 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 3/9/9,granting 817 Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce/Permit Registration of the Judgment for Enforcement in Other Districts. Plaintiff may register judgment in the No. Dist. of IL; District of NJ; So. Dist of FL; District of Columbia, the E. Dist of VI, Dist of MD and Dist of CO. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
January 5, 2009 782 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 699 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting 710 Motion for Permanent Injunction; granting in part and denying in part 712 Motionfor Costs and Prejudgment Interest; denying 714 Motion for Enhanced Damages ; granting in part and denying in part 716 Motion for Attorney Fees (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
February 4, 2008 623 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 4, 2008. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
February 1, 2008 620 Opinion or Order of the Court Court's Proposed Special Verdict Form. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 1, 2008. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Funai Electric Company, Ltd. v. Daewoo Electronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?