Los Angeles Biomedical Research Institute at Harbor UCLA Medical Center. v. White

Case Number: 3:2004cv02201
Filed: June 4, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2011 474 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 473 Stipulation to Continue: Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/9/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
March 14, 2011 472 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/14/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
January 18, 2011 470 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 469 Stipulation To Continue: Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/18/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
September 16, 2010 468 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 467 Stipulation Extending Dates Set Forth In Various Orders From This Court. Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/16/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/16/2010 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2010 465 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RENEWING DISCOVERY REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/9/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
February 9, 2010 461 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/9/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
October 19, 2009 456 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 12/11/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Joint Status Report due 12/4/2009. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/19/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Los Angeles Biomedical Research Institute at Harbor UCLA Medical Center. v. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?