Konig v. State Bar of California et al

Plaintiff: Alan Konig
Defendant: State Bar of California, Lawrence J. Dal Cerro, Russell Weiner, Allen Blumenthal and Robert Hawley
Intervenor: Philip E. Kay
Case Number: 3:2004cv02210
Filed: June 4, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2009 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART REMAINING PORTION OF NON-PARTY PHILIP KAY'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE AND TO UNSEAL RECORDS; VACATING HEARING. To the extent Kay seeks leave to intervene herein for the limited purpose of filing th e instant motion, the motion is granted. To the extent Kay seeks an order unsealing documents, other than those documents ordered unsealed by the Court's March 3, 2009 order, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 3, 2009 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION OF NON-PARTY PHILIP E. KAY FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE AND TO UNSEAL RECORDS; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK; DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, Docket Nos. 24, 31, 35, 37, 62, 63, 98, 99, 126, 128, and 130 are unse aled in their entirety; the Clerk is directed to file said documents in the public record. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, Docket Nos. 25, 36, 49, 94, 95, 96, 97, 100, 101, 102, 127, 129 are unsealed in part, and, further, portions of Dock et Nos. 95, 96 and 97 shall remain sealed pending resolution of the State Bar's argument said portions are work product. Defendants shall file in the public record, no later than March 9, 2009, redacted versions of Docket Nos. 25, 36, 49, 94, 95, 96, 97, 100, 101, 102, 127 and 129. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 3, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
February 25, 2009 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING NON-PARTY PHILIP E. KAY'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO UNSEAL. Any opposition or response to the Motion to Unseal shall be filed no later than Monday, March 2, 2009. Kay's reply shall be filed no later than Friday, March 6, 2009, by 4:00 p.m. The Court will conduct a hearing on Friday, March 13, 2009, at 9:00 a.m.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 25, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Konig v. State Bar of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Konig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bar of California
Represented By: Emilia J. Mayorga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence J. Dal Cerro
Represented By: Heather Anne Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Weiner
Represented By: Heather Anne Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Blumenthal
Represented By: Heather Anne Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hawley
Represented By: Heather Anne Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Philip E. Kay
Represented By: Karl Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?