Willis et al v. City of Oakland et al

Plaintiff: Lillie Willis and Lavita Oliver
Defendant: City of Oakland, Richard Word, Fought and Clement
Case Number: 3:2004cv02305
Filed: October 19, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2012 207 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 206 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Dismissal Of Entire Action filed by Clement, Fought, Richard Word, City of Oakland. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/25/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
December 12, 2011 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/12/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 5, 2011 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
October 26, 2011 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/12/2011 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/2/2011.. Signed by Judge James Ware on October 26, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
September 30, 2011 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TRIAL SCHEDULE Jury Selection set for 12/6/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 12/6/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 12/8/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2011 01:00 PM in Cour troom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 12/13/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 12/14/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco bef ore Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 12/15/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 12/16/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/30/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 8, 2011 191 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER - (JURY TRIAL):Joint Pretrial Conference Statement, In Limine Motions, and Proposed Jury Instructions due by 9/16/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2011 11:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 1 1/1/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial Date and Sessions: Sessions 1-4 set for 11/1/2011 - 11/4/2011 01:00 PM to 04:00 PM; Sessions 5-6 set for 11/8/2011 - 11/9/2011, 01:00 PM to 04:00 PM before Hon. James Ware.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/7/2011. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
June 9, 2011 185 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/9/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
March 24, 2011 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE JOINT STATEMENT. The Court finds Plaintiff's letter is insufficient as it is ex parte and does not provide the Court with Defendants' perspective. Accordingly, on or before April 1, 2011, the p arties shall file a Joint Statement to update the Court as to the current status of the case and in the event that the case is not settled by Judge Larson at the scheduled May settlement conference, the parties shall provide a good faith proposed schedule as to how this case should proceed. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/24/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
December 23, 2009 153 Opinion or Order of the Court Letter from Dennis Cunningham. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
October 19, 2009 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendants file reply memorandum in support of their motion for summary judgment not later than 11/3/09 (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
April 9, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/9/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
January 23, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER.Further Settlement Conference set for 2/10/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Updated confidential statements due 7 days prior to the hearing. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/23/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 21, 2009 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring to Judge Spero for further settlement conference (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
December 18, 2008 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 122 Order Settlement Conference set for 1/13/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 12/18/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 16, 2008 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 121 referring the matter to Mag. Judge James for a settlement conference. Request filed by Lillie Willis, Lavita Oliver (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis et al v. City of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Willis
Represented By: Adam Cabral Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavita Oliver
Represented By: Adam Cabral Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Represented By: James F. Hodgkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Word
Represented By: James F. Hodgkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fought
Represented By: James F. Hodgkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clement
Represented By: James F. Hodgkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?