Securities and Exchange Commission v. Prabhat K. Goyal
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Prabhat K. Goyal
Case Number: 3:2004cv02372
Filed: March 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER continuing cmc to 12/16/10 @ 3 p.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER continuing cmc to 10/1/10 @ 3 p.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER continuing cmc to 8/6/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER continuing cmc to 6/4/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER continuing cmc to 4/2/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER CONTINUING CMC TO 2/5/10 @ 3 P.M. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER continuing cmc to 8/7/09 @ 3 p.m.. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/21/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING request to continue case management ; 10/31/08 cmc remains on calendar. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/28/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Prabhat K. Goyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Stephen L Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prabhat K. Goyal
Represented By: Elizabeth Rogers Brannen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?