Newcal Industries, Inc. et al v. Ikon Office Solutions, Inc., et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv02776
Filed: July 12, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Fern M Smith
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2013 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING (115 in 3:10-cv-05974-JSW) and (203 in 3:04-cv-02776-JSW) STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 4, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
December 3, 2012 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING (201 in 3:04-cv-02776-JSW) Stipulation to Stay Action Pending Finalization of Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
October 16, 2012 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS to Judge Beeler. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 16, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
August 1, 2012 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER To Set Hearing Date re (172 in 3:04-cv-02776-JSW) Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 1 and 2 filed by Ikon Office Solutions, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Beeler on 08/01/2012. (JUDGE BEELER, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
July 5, 2012 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (164 in 3:04-cv-02776-JSW) Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ikon Office Solutions, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Beeler on 07/05/20121. (JUDGE BEELER, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
June 4, 2012 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OTHER PRETRIAL DEADLINES: Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Dispositve Motion Hearing / Mo tion to Sever set for 4/5/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 7/1/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/4/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
May 22, 2012 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Joint Requests for Leave to Make Presentations at Further Settlement Conference and to Bring Equipment for Presentations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/22/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
April 25, 2012 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (84 in 3:10-cv-05974-JSW) Proposed Order,, filed by Documation of East Texas, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, New England Copy Specialists, Inc., Metro Sales Inc., Copytex, Inc., Global Services, LLC, ASI Busines s Solutions, Ltd., Ray Morgan Company, Documation of San Antonio, Inc., Documation of North Texas, Inc., IKON Office Solutions, Inc., Simile Imaging Solutions, Wood Business Systems, Documation of Austin, Inc., (161 in 3:04-cv-02776-JSW ) Proposed Order, filed by General Electric Capital Corporation, CPO, Ltd., Pinnacle Document Systems, Inc., Pacific Office Automatic, Inc., Ikon Office Solutions, Inc.,, Kearns Business Solutions, Inc., Newcal Industries, Inc.. Signed by Judge Beeler on 4/25/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 12, 2012 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Request for Leave to Make Presentation at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/12/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
January 31, 2012 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 144 Notice of Change In Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/31/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
January 30, 2012 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
August 29, 2011 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY FOR RELATED CASES. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
July 20, 2011 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 128 Stipulation to 7-Day Continuance of Case Management Conference in View of Counsel's Schedule Conflicts: Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/20/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
May 19, 2011 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
February 25, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON 78 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution or for Alternative Sanctions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 25, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 23, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE,. re doc 107 Stipulation filed by Ikon Office Solutions, Inc. Motion hearing date: 5/20/2011 at 9:00a.m. Case Management Conference is continued from 4/29/2011 to 6/24/2011 at 1:30p.m.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/23/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 16, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 02/16/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newcal Industries, Inc. et al v. Ikon Office Solutions, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?