Cybersource Corporation v. Retail Decision, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv03268
Filed: August 11, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Patent Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:183 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2009 222 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/14/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
March 27, 2009 220 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 164 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of invalidity of US Patent number 6,029,154, claims 2 and 3 ; Judgment to be entered accordingly(awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
February 20, 2009 193 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re page limit for plaintiff's opposition to RED's invalidity 102, 103 motion; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/20/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
January 27, 2009 180 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to allow defendant to exeed page limit on motions for summary judgment; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/27/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 6, 2009 161 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES; Claim construction Hearing reset for 3/19/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/5/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 17, 2008 158 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for the joint statement and other Patent Local rule 4-3 requirements to and including 12/19/2008; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/17/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
November 14, 2008 146 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DEADLINES; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/14/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
October 10, 2008 126 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel denying 86 Motion for Summary Judgment (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 7, 2008 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant's motion 109 to file portions of defendant's motion to permit defendant to proceed with deposition; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/7/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
September 19, 2008 103 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting briefing and pretrial/trial schedules (as amended by court): Jury Trial reset for 1/19/2010 08:30 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2009 02:30 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/19/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 10, 2008 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant's application for attorney Scott J Bornstein to appear pro hac vice; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/10/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cybersource Corporation v. Retail Decision, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?