Ellis v. Costco Wholesale Corporation

Plaintiff: Shirley "Rae" Ellis and Leah Horstman
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 3:2004cv03341
Filed: August 17, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2015 907 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 906 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Granting Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Elaine Sasaki's Claims filed by Elaine Sasaki. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/28/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
July 6, 2015 886 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen; deferring ruling on 868 Defendant's Motion in Limine; granting 869 Defendant's Motion in Limine; deferring ruling on 870 Defendant's Motion in Limine; denying 871 Defendant's Motion in Limine; deferring ruling on 872 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 875 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
June 3, 2015 861 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 860 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Expert Testimony at Trial filed by Elaine Sasaki. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
May 22, 2015 854 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 814 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 4, 2015 851 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Supplemental Briefing for 814 Defendant's motion for summary judgment. Supplemental briefing shall be filed by May 7, 2015, at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/4/2015. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
March 30, 2015 829 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 812 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Granting Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff's Disparate Impact Claim filed by Elaine Sasaki. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/30/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 6, 2015 808 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 805 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Appointment of Special Master filed by Elaine Sasaki, Shirley "Rae" Ellis, Leah Horstman. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/6/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
February 19, 2015 803 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 802 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re (1) Three-Week Extension of 2/27/15 Non-Expert Discovery Deadline, and (2) Three-Week Extension of Expert-Related Deadlines of 2/27/15, 3/18/15, and 4/10/15 filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation Discovery due by 3/20/2015.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
January 23, 2015 799 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 798 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re One-Week Extensions of Dates for (1) 1/29/15 Status Conference, (2) 2/20/15 Non-Expert Discovery Deadline, and (3) Expert-Related Days of 2/20/15, 3/13/15, and 4/3/15 fil ed by Costco Wholesale Corporation Discovery due by 2/27/2015. Status Report due by 1/29/2015. Status Conference set for 2/5/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
September 17, 2014 797 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 796 Business Center issue filed by Elaine Sasaki, Shirley "Rae" Ellis, Leah Horstman. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/17/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
January 24, 2014 769 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 768 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding (1) Extension of Briefing Deadlines Re Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs and (2) Hearing Date on Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Costco Wholesal e Corporation, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 768 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding (1) Extension of Briefing Deadlines Re Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs and (2) Hearing Date on Motion for Attorneys' Fees, 760 MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Responses due by 1/31/2014. Replies due by 3/4/2014.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/24/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 22, 2014 767 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/22/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
December 10, 2013 754 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 753 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (CORRECTED) Regarding Extension of Deadlines for Filing (1) Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval and (2) Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Costco Wh olesale Corporation, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 753 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (CORRECTED) Regarding Extension of Deadlines for Filing (1) Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval and (2) Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Motions due by 12/17/2013. Motion Hearing (Prelminary approval of settlement) set for 2/6/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Motion Hearing (attorney's fees)set for 3/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/10/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
October 16, 2013 749 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 748 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation & Proposed Order Vacating Pre-Trial & Trial Deadlines filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Elaine Sasaki, Shirley "Rae" Ellis, Leah Horstman Status Report due by 12/5/2013. Status Conference set for 12/12/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/16/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
April 8, 2013 720 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 719 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Order Re Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Elaine Sasaki, Shirley "Rae" Ellis, Leah Horstman. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/8/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
March 27, 2013 717 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 716 late opt-outs filed by Shirley "Rae" Ellis, Leah Horstman. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/27/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 15, 2013 714 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 712 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Filing of Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
January 14, 2013 711 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING STATUS FROM 1/17/13 TO 3/21/13 AT 10:30 A.M.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/14/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 11, 2012 707 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 705 Temporal Scope of Discovery. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/11/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
November 27, 2012 702 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 701 Regarding Communications With Class Members filed by Shirley "Rae" Ellis, Leah Horstman. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/27/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
October 15, 2012 696 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 695 TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
September 25, 2012 693 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 664 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; and Denying 543 Defendant's Motion to Eliminate Class Claims. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
August 13, 2012 686 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re re 684 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decisions filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, 684 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decisions filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/13/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
June 4, 2012 662 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 661 Regarding Briefing on Rule 23 Motions filed by Shirley "Rae" Ellis, Leah Horstman, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 661 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing on Rule 23 Motions, 543 MOTION for an Order Eliminating Class Claims. Responses due by 6/8/2012. Ps' reply in support of class certification by 7/13/12. Replies due by 6/29/2012.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/4/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
April 12, 2012 540 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 539 Stipulation filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2012. Case Management Conference specially set for 5/8/2012 01:15 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/12/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
February 21, 2012 532 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
May 20, 2011 524 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STATISTICALLY CLOSING ACTION; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/20/2011.(awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley "Rae" Ellis
Represented By: Julia Campins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Horstman
Represented By: Julia Campins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: David D. Kadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?